Hawg Tools, LLC v. Newsco International Energy Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hawg Tools, LLC
Defendant: Newsco International Energy Service Inc and Joe Ficken
Case Number: 1:2014cv03011
Filed: November 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Open Case. Plaintiff Hawg Tools, LLC's Motion To Lift Stay Entered on March 9, 2015 [Doc. # 61 ] and To Administratively Reopen Case [# 62 ], filed July 28, 2017, is denied. The Order of Reference [# 64 ], filed August 2, 2017, is withdrawn, and Plaintiff Hawg Tools, LLC's Motion for Leave To File Second Amended Complaint [# 63 ], filed August 2, 2017, is denied as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/13/2017. (athom, )
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER SUSTAINING 41 OBJECTION TO ORDER OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: The Order on Defendant's 30 Motion for Stay is VACATED. Defendants' 20 Motion for Stay is GRANTED. Defendants' [46 ] Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and (6) Motion to Dismiss is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUIDCE as moot. The 60 Report and Recommendation on Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and (6) Motion to Dismiss is REJECTED as moot. This action is CLOSED ADMINISTRATIVELY, and the clerk is DIRECTED to close this civil action administratively, subject to reopening for good cause. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/9/2015.(alowe)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER granting 57 Motion to Clarify Trial Date and Amended Trial Preparation Conference Order. The 33 Trial Preparation Conference Order is AMENDED at page 4, 3 to provide: That the court reserves five (5) days for trial: Monday, 11/30/2015, through Thursday, 12/3/2015; and Monday, 12/7/2015. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/3/2015. (alowe)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's proposed sur-response is ACCEPTED FOR FILING and Defendants may file a sur-reply if they wish no later than 2/6/2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/28/2015. (alowe)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO DISMISS: The Order of Reference [# 26 ] filed 11/26/2014 is WITHDRAWN, and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and (6) [# 24 ] filed 11/26/2014 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as moot. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/23/2014. (alowe)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Motions due by 7/28/2015. 5-Day Jury Trial set for 11/30/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/6/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/214. (alowe)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 20 Motion for Stay, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/09/2014.(slibi, )
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/07/2014. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 12/16/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (slibi, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawg Tools, LLC v. Newsco International Energy Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawg Tools, LLC
Represented By: Laura J. Ellenberger
Represented By: Anthony L. Leffert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newsco International Energy Service Inc
Represented By: Gregory Steve Hearing, II
Represented By: Thomas Baker Quinn
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Ficken
Represented By: Gregory Steve Hearing, II
Represented By: Thomas Baker Quinn
Represented By: Tamara Ann Seelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?