Dixon v. Corrections Corporation of America

Plaintiff: Virgil Dixon
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Case Number: 1:2014cv03042
Filed: November 10, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Bent
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSIAL WITH PREJUDICE granting 27 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/06/2015.(mdave, )
September 1, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery for Limited Purpose of Taking Plaintiff's Deposition by Defendant Corrections Corporation of America; granting 23 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Conduct a Deposition of Incarcerated Inmate Plaintiff Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(a)(2)(B) by Defendant Corrections Corporation of America, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/01/2015. Discovery due by 9/9/2015.(slibi, )
July 6, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/6/2015. Discovery due by 8/17/2015.(mdave, )
November 12, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/12/2014. (slibi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Corrections Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Dixon
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?