Peraza v. Martinez et al
Plaintiff: |
Paul Peraza |
Defendant: |
Martinez, Kemena and USA |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv03056 |
Filed: |
November 12, 2014 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Gordon P. Gallagher |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 28, 2016 |
Filing
78
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 52 Motion to Compel Discovery Re: Plaintiff's First Production Request; denying without prejudice 61 Motion to Compel Discovery Re: Plaintiff's Third Request for Production; denying without prejudice 70 Second Motion to Compel Re: Third Production Request; denying without prejudice 72 Motion to Amend His 11-11-15 Motion Re: Exhibit 2, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/28/2016.(slibi, )
|
December 16, 2015 |
Filing
77
MINUTE ORDER granting 75 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay and Extend Deadlines. Case is STAYED up to and including 3/15/2016. Final Pretrial Conference 1/20/2016 10:00 AM is vacated. Status Conference set for 3/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/16/2015.(emill)
|
November 4, 2015 |
Filing
63
MINUTE ORDER denying 46 Motion to Compel Discovery RE: Plaintiff's Second Request for Production; denying 48 Motion to Compel Discovery RE: Plaintiff's Second Interrogatories to United States; denying 50 Motion to Compel Discovery RE: Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to United States, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/04/2015.(slibi, )
|
October 7, 2015 |
Filing
55
MINUTE ORDER Granting 44 Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion to Question Non-Party Witness Via Interrgatorie [sic] and Deposition Deadline Expansion Request. Granting 45 Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff's Motion to Amend His 9-9-15, Motion, Re: Exhibit 4. Discovery due by 11/13/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2015. Scheduling Order 35 is amended. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/7/2015.(emill)
|
September 2, 2015 |
Filing
41
ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to Take Deposition, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/2/2015.(emill)
|
February 2, 2015 |
Filing
19
ORDER granting 18 Defendant United States of America's Motion to Vacate February 4, 2015, Status Conference. Status Conference 2/4/2015 10:00 AM is vacated. Counsel for the United States shall forthwith inform the appropriate staff at t he facility where plaintiff is housed that this conference has been vacated. Deadline to file Pilot Program Consent Form 3/21/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/2/2015. (emill)
|
December 23, 2014 |
Filing
8
ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge, and, if applicable to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/23/14. (nmarb, )
|
November 18, 2014 |
Filing
6
AMENDED ORDER re: 5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/18/14. (nmarb, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?