Beltran v. Noonan et al
Plaintiff: Johana Paola Beltran
Defendant: Pamela H Noonan, Thomas J Noonan, InterExchange, Inc., USAuPair, INC, GreatAuPair, LLC, Expert Group International, Inc, EuRaupair InterCultural Child Care Programs, Cultural Homestay International, Cultural Care, Inc., AuPairCare, Inc., Au Pair International, Inc., APF Global Exchange, NFP, American Institute for Foreign Study, American Cultural Exchange, LLC, Agent Au Pair, A.P.E.X. American Professional Exchange, LLC and 20/20 Care Exchange, Inc
Case Number: 1:2014cv03074
Filed: November 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 AMENDED ORDER Granting Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/1/2019. (swest)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES. Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses is GRANTED. (Doc. # 1206 .) Class Counsel shall receive attorneys' fees in the amount of $22,925,000, from t he Qualified Settlement Fund ("QSF"), representing 35% of the QSF; In addition to attorneys' fees, Class Counsel shall receive $3,345,535.33 for litigation expenses and expenses for administration of the settlement and sen ding of notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1715, which shall also be deducted from the QSF; and $536 shall be taxed from the QSF in favor of the United States as reimbursement for in forma pauperis filing and service fees advanced on behalf of the lead named Plaintiff, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/18/2019. (evana, )
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 ORDER ON TRIAL PREPARATION AND SCHEDULING. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/3/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/15/2018. (athom, )
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify the Order Denying Motions for Summary Judgment and, Upon Reconsideration, Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify the Order Denying Motions for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 1118 ) is GRANTED. Defendants' preemption defense is SUMMARILY DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/06/2018. (athom, )
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 ORDER Denying 859 , 860 , 863 , 864 , 866 , 867 , 869 , 871 , 873 , 877 , 879 , 884 , 890 , and 915 Motions for Summary Judgment. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/19/2018. (athom, )
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 ORDER granting 944 Motion to Exclude the Summary Judgment Testimony of Stanley Colvin, Esq. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/14/18. (dkals, )
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER Dismissing Certain Defendants' Dispositive Motions and Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Rationalize the Procedure and Page Limits for those Dispositive Motions. Plaintiffs' Motion to Rationalize the Procedure and Page Limits (D oc. # 1047 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion for a Forthwith Hearing (Doc. # 1049 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant Cultural Care's Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint In Part (Doc. # 1043 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to assert such arguments in any Motion for Summary Judgment that may be filed. Defendant AIFS's Motion to Dismiss Count IX (Doc. # 1031 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to assert such arguments in any Motion for Summary Judgment that may be filed. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/02/2018. (athom, )
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 ORDER granting 1011 Motion for Order: Order on Rule 23 Notification Plan. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/01/2018. (athom, )
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 977 ORDER on All Parties' 851 Joint Report Regarding Proposed Rule 23 Notification Plan. Plaintiffs shall file a Third Amended Complaint that includes the three additional named plaintiffs on or before 4/16/2018. The Third Amended Complaint shall be the operative complaint going forward. The case caption in all future filings shall include the newly-added named plaintiffs. The parties shall confer regarding the Court's resolutions of their disputes described herein. The parties shall submit a revised proposed notice and a revised proposed notification plan that incorporate the Court's rulings in this Order on or before 4/16/2018. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/09/2018. (athom, )
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 969 ORDER on Depositions of FLSA Opt-In Class Members. Defendant Cultural Care's Motion for Clarification (Doc. # 924 ) is DENIED and Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order (Doc. # 953 ) is GRANTED IN PART. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 04/04/2018. (athom, )
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 955 ORDER Affirming United States Magistrate Judge's Order on Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony. Defendants' Objections (Doc. # 830 ) to the Magistrate Judge's Order are DENIED. The Magistrate Judge's Order (Doc. # 813 ) is AFFIRMED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/27/2018. (athom, )
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 905 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' 842 Motion to Compel and for Relief. The Court GRANTS IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Doc. # 842 ) to the extent that it requests production of the Zherka Documents. It is ORDERED that Defendants and the Alliance provide Plaintiffs the Zherka Documents, without redactions. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (id.) is DENIED IN PART as to Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees and costs. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/21/2018.
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 858 ORDER granting 786 Motion for Reconsideration. The July 24 Order by Magistrate Judge Tafoya (Doc. # 624 ) is VACATED only to the extent that it denied Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel as to Defendant AIFS. Defendant AIFS shall produce financ ial documents fully responsive to Plaintiffs' Request No. 16 on or before 3/2/2018. Plaintiffs shall submit supplemental briefing as to the amount of costs and attorneys' fees it requests on or before 3/2/2018. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/16/2018. (athom, )
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 850 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 564 Motion to Amend Complaint. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/13/2018. (athom, )
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 843 ORDER Reversing in Part United States Magistrate Judge's Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and for Relief. Plaintiffs' Objections (Doc. # 771 ) to the Magistrate Judge's Order (Doc. # 763 ) are SUSTAINED. The Magistrat e Judge's Order (Doc. # 763 ) is VACATED as an Order and is instead construed as a Report and Recommendation, which is ADOPTED IN PART only as to its recommendation that the parties' Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (Doc. # 747 ). Defendants and the Alliance are ORDERED to provide Plaintiffs unredacted versions of the Alliance's documents at issue. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/12/2018. (athom, )
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER denying 606 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of William Kerr Pursuant to F.R.E. 702 by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/24/2018. (jgonz, )
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER Adopting and Affirming in Part 240 February 22, 2016 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge as indicated in the attached Order. Defendants' Objections (Doc. ## 247 , 248 ) are OVERRULED IN PART. 127 , 130 , 131 , and [13 6] Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED IN PART as indicated in the attached Order. 135 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED in its entirety. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Oral Argument Regarding Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (Doc. # 257 ) is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/31/2016. (athom, )
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; This Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the Joint Motion by Certain Defendants to Dismiss the FirstAmended Complaint and Certification of Compliance with Civil Practice Standard 7.1D. 135 be DENI ED; RECOMMENDS Defendant Cultural Care, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss All Claims in First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) 127 , Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint by Defendant InterExchange, Inc. 130 , D efendant American Cultural Exchange, L.L.C., D/B/A Go Au Pairs Motion to Dismiss Counts I, III, IV, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX and X of the First Amended Complaint 131 , Defendant American Institute for Foreign Studys Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint [ 136] should be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Additionally, it is ORDERED that Defendant Cultural Care, Inc.s Motion to Strike Material in PlaintiffsConsolidated Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss 206 and PlaintiffsCross-Motion to Strike Certain Exhibits Submitted by the Defendants 221 are DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/22/16. (morti, )
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER denying 134 Joint Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/16/15.(nmarb, )
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held on 7/6/2015 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendant Cultural Care, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order 160 is GRANTED. Joint Motion by Certain Sponsor Defendants for P rotective Order 162 is GRANTED. Defendant InterExchange, Inc., American Cultural Exchange, LLC, and American Institute for Foreign Study's Motion for Protective Order to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss 164 is GRANT ED. Discovery is STAYED pending the issuance of a recommendation on Defendants' motions to dismiss. The parties shall file a Status Report within 10 days of the recommendation on the motions to dismiss indicating the next course of action, as discussed. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The court shall hold a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling and planning conference on 7/6/2015 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/11/2015. (athom, )
November 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Drawing Case; This case shall be drawn to a presiding judge, and when applicable to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/15/14. (morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltran v. Noonan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johana Paola Beltran
Represented By: Alexander Neville Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela H Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterExchange, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAuPair, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreatAuPair, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expert Group International, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EuRaupair InterCultural Child Care Programs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cultural Homestay International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cultural Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AuPairCare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Au Pair International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APF Global Exchange, NFP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Institute for Foreign Study
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cultural Exchange, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent Au Pair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P.E.X. American Professional Exchange, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20/20 Care Exchange, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?