Estate of Loretta Barela et al v. City and County of Denver et al
Plaintiff: |
Estate of Loretta Barela, Maria Cruz, Eddie Rosa, Ray Rosa and Cleotide Roll |
Defendant: |
City and County of Denver Colorado, Denver Police Dispatcher TSH, Denver Police Dispatcher BAR, Denver Police Dispatcher TDP, Denver Police Dispatcher SMC, Denver Police Officer Radio Identifier 432A, Denver Police Officer Radio Identifier 435A and Christopher Perea |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv03094 |
Filed: |
November 17, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 18, 2016 |
Filing
107
JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of City and County of Denver Colorado, Bridget Rhodes, Jennifer France, Scott Crawford, Susan Mercado, Timmothy Hucksoll, Timothy Packman against Estate of Loretta Barela re: 106 Order Overruling Objections and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. By Clerk on 3/18/16. (kfinn)
|
March 16, 2016 |
Filing
106
ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTINGRECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Granting 90 Report and Recommendations; Granting 42 City and County of DenversMotion To Dismiss; Granting 52 Motion To Dismiss of TimothyPackman; Granting 63 Denver Defendants Motion ToDismiss. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/16/2015.(cmira)
|
June 16, 2015 |
Filing
89
ORDER dismissing the plaintiffs' fourth claim for relief by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/16/15. (dkals, )
|
May 21, 2015 |
Filing
76
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/21/15. (bsimm, )
|
May 5, 2015 |
Filing
67
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: 10-Day Jury Trial set for 6/6/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/13/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/5/2015. (alowe)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing
65
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 5/4/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Motion to Dismiss 20 is WITHDRAWN. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve of copy of the proposed Scheduling Order 61 to Mr. Perea. The Parties will submit a proposed Stipulated Protective Order, or a Protective Order identifying the areas of disagreement, on or before 5/4/2015 for the court's consideration. Plaintiff will submit a Notice with the Notice of Appeal a nd any associated papers related to Mr. Perea's criminal appeal no later than 5/6/2015, for consideration by the court in conjunction with the pending motions to stay. The Proposed Scheduling Order will not be entered until after Mr. Perea has an opportunity to review the proposed order. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )
|
March 10, 2015 |
Filing
29
MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Motion to Amend Case Caption. The Clerk is directed to amend the docket to reflect the newly named Defendants. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/10/2015. (alowe) Modified text on 3/10/2015 (alowe).
|
February 20, 2015 |
Filing
19
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y Wang on 2/20/15 granting 17 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. The City shall identify the Doe Defendants to Plaintiffs no later than the close of business on 2/27/2015. The Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2015 01:30 PM is converted into a telephonic Status Conference. Counsel are instructed to initiate a conference call between themselves prior to contacting the court at 303.335.2600 at the designated time. (bsimm, )
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing
6
ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/25/14. Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (bsimm, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?