Reiskin et al v. Regional Transportation District

Plaintiff: Julie Reiskin, Jon Jamie Lewis, William Joe Beaver, Douglas Howey and Colorado Cross-Disability Coalition
Defendant: Regional Transportation District
Case Number: 1:2014cv03111
Filed: November 18, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2016 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That, with the consent of the magistrate judge, the Order of Reference 68 , filed June 29, 2015, is withdrawn; That Plaintiffs Motion To Dismiss Defendant RTDs Counterclaim 57 , filed June 6, 2016, is denied without prejudice; That RTDs Motion for Summary Judgment To Dismiss Plaintiffs CCDC, Reiskin, Howey and Lewis 67 , filed June 29, 2015, is denied without prejudice; and That Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Liability 100 , filed August 19, 2015, is denied without prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/23/2016.(evana, )
November 12, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; 98 Stipulated Motion to Stay Discovery and Extend Discovery Deadlines for Sixty (60) Days, With Request for Expedited Ruling is GRANTED. Discovery in this case is STAYED through 1/8/06. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadlines listed below are extended as indicated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Deadline for Plaintiffs to file a motion for class certification is May 25, 2016, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/12/15.(morti, )
September 9, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 92 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion To Withdraw All Claims of Plaintiff Bianca Gamel, Bianca Gamel terminated. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/9/2015. (mlace, )
August 27, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 RTD's Motion To Strike Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Liability 82 , or in the Alternative, for Extension of Time To Respond. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/27/2015.(mlace, )
June 19, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiffs' 62 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Class Action Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall accept Plaintiffs Amended Class Action Complaint [#62-2] for filing as of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Class Action Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3), by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/19/15.(morti, )
June 18, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file Third Amended Class Action Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. 59 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/18/15.(morti, )
May 21, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint is GRANTED and Plaintiffs Second Amended Class Action Complaint [#43-2] is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. Defendant shall r espond to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). 39 Defendant RTD's Motion for Partial Dismissal is DENIED as moot. 41 Defendant RTD's Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/21/15.(morti, )
February 25, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Motions due by 12/29/2015. 14-Day Jury Trial set for 8/29/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/12/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/25/2015. (alowe)
February 24, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/24/15. (lgale, )
February 19, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 22 Motion for Leave to File Amended Class Action Complaint. Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint is deemed to be the operative complaint as of the date of this Order. Plaintiffs shall file the notice and redline required by D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a) on or before 2/26/2015. Defendants' 19 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/19/2015.(alowe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reiskin et al v. Regional Transportation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Reiskin
Represented By: Andrew Christopher Montoya
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Jamie Lewis
Represented By: Andrew Christopher Montoya
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Joe Beaver
Represented By: Andrew Christopher Montoya
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Howey
Represented By: Andrew Christopher Montoya
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Cross-Disability Coalition
Represented By: Andrew Christopher Montoya
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Transportation District
Represented By: Jenifer M. Ross-Amato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?