Mandrell v. Physicians Health Partners

Plaintiff: Phillip S. Mandrell
Defendant: Physicians Health Partners
Case Number: 1:2014cv03245
Filed: November 28, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is dismissed in its entirety, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/20/2017. (jgonz, )
June 9, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Appeal Court's Order of Denial to Appoint Counsel is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/9/15.(morti, )
January 21, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/21/15. Colorado Department of Corrections is dismissed. (dkals, )
December 4, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Letter by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/4/14. (dkals, )
December 3, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/3/14. (morti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mandrell v. Physicians Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip S. Mandrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?