Watkins v. Breneman et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Watkins
Defendant: Alan Breneman, Alan (I) Breneman and City and County of Denver, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2014cv03266
Filed: December 2, 2014
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE The Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice ECF No. 37 is hereby GRANTED. All claims against Defendants in this matter are dismissed with prejudice, without costs or fees to any party. Accordingly, the case is hereby ordered to be closed. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close the case, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/28/2015. (evana, )
September 22, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint with respect to the claims against Defendant City and County of Denver, Colorado, and the claims against Defendant City and County of Denver, Colorado are DISMIS SED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint ECF No. 18 , with respect to the claims against Defendant Breneman, is CONVERTED to a Motion for Summary Judgment. Any party who wishes to submit additional materials for the Court to consider in connection with the Motion for Summary Judgment shall do so by Wednesday, October 7, 2015. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/22/2015. (evana, )
March 9, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 24 the parties Stipulated Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for March 30, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. It will be reset, if necessary, after resolution of the Motion to Dismiss 18 , by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/9/2015.(evana, )
March 5, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/5/15. Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery # 23 is GRANTED.(lgale, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Breneman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Breneman
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan (I) Breneman
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver, Colorado
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Watkins
Represented By: Kevin Steven Pauly
Represented By: Faisal Ahmed Salahuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?