Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc. v. JE Hurley Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc.
Defendant: JE Hurley Construction, Inc. and Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv03269
Filed: December 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Joint Motion to Dismiss, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the reservation of claims and defenses as set forth in the motion, and the parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/6/2015. (ktera)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Third Joint Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. This matter shall continue to be held in abeyance until April 15, 2015. Parties shall advise the Court by that date as to the status of this action, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/1/15. (ktera)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THIS MATTER is before the Court on the parties Joint Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. Having reviewed the same and finding good cause, IT IS ORDERED that this matter shall be held in abeyance until March 31, 2015, and the parties shall advise the Court by that date whether the matter has been settled or whether the parties intend to proceed with the litigation or arbitration of this dispute, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/2/2015.(evana, )
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THIS MATTER is before the Court on the parties Joint Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. Having reviewed the same and finding good cause, IT IS ORDERED that this matter shall be held in abeyance until February 27, 2015, and the parties shall advise the Court by that date whether the matter has been settled or whether the parties intend to proceed with the litigation or arbitration of this dispute, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/31/2014. (evana, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc. v. JE Hurley Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aggregate Industries - WCR, Inc.
Represented By: Paul G. Urtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JE Hurley Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?