Hilb v. HSCB Bank, USA et al
Plaintiff: Peter Hilb
Defendant: HSCB Bank, USA, Bank of America National Association, Michael P. Medved and Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2014cv03350
Filed: December 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 12/10/2015 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Motion to Dismiss 65 is taken under advisement. Motion to Dismiss 70 is taken under advisement. Parties shall notify the Court, on or before 1/8/2016, if they seek court sponsored settlement. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (bsimm, )
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 8/25/2015. Withdrawing 41 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Finding as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss. Finding as moot 26 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an unopposed motion for leave to file a second amended complaint by 9/9/2015. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 2/2/2015. Denying without prejudice 13 Motion to Dismiss and 15 Motion for More Definite Statement. The Plaintiff is given leave to file an amended complaint on or before February 11, 2015. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilb v. HSCB Bank, USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Hilb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSCB Bank, USA
Represented By: Donna Hope Bakalor
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America National Association
Represented By: Ian Trevor Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Medved
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated
Represented By: Donna Hope Bakalor
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?