O'Rourke v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph O'Rourke
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv03434
Filed: December 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER on Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice. ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/08/15. (jhawk, )
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to File an Amended Answer, submitted to the Court as Exhibit B to its Unopposed Motion to File an Amended Answer, shall be deemed filed as of the date of this Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/31/15. (ktera)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Counsel shall comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the Protective Order 15 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/25/15. (ktera)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2015 02:30 PM in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 12, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/6/2015. (evana, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Rourke v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph O'Rourke
Represented By: Karen Virginia Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?