K.B. v. Perez et al
Plaintiff: |
K. B. |
Defendant: |
Christopher J. Perez and Walter Vanni |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv03514 |
Filed: |
December 31, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Arapahoe |
Presiding Judge: |
Boyd N. Boland |
Presiding Judge: |
William P Johnson |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 1, 2016 |
Filing
46
FINAL JUDGMENT re: 45 Order on Motion to Dismiss in favor of Christopher J. Perez against K. B. Signed by Clerk on 04/01/2016. (athom, )
|
February 2, 2016 |
Filing
41
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 40 Unopposed Motion to Reset March 18, 2016 Hearing. The Motion Hearing re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint is rescheduled for 3/22/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 702 before William P Johnson. Signed by William P Johnson on 02/02/2016. (athom, )
|
August 6, 2015 |
Filing
27
ORDER granting 24 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. By William P Johnson on 08/06/2015. (athom, )
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing
22
ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/20/15. A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/28/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bsimm, )
|
July 16, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/16/15. The Order to Show Cause 16 is hereby DISCHARGED; Pursuant to the Stipulation 20 , Defendant Perez shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 8/7/2015; and The Clerk of Court is instructed to amend the docket to reflect that Walter Vanni has been dismissed from this action. (bsimm, )
|
January 8, 2015 |
Filing
7
ORDER the First Claim for equitable relief is hereby dismissed. The Second Claim may proceed, but that the undersigned recuses himself from this matter going forward and that the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to confer with the Chief Judge f or determination as to whether to reassign the case to another District Judge of this District, to arrange for a visiting judge to be assigned this matter, or for such other instruction as she deems appropriate. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/8/2015. (tscha, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?