Moore v. Zimmer et al
Plaintiff: George Moore
Defendant: Carmen Kassety, Zimmer, Denver City Jail Director, Elias Diggins and Denver Health DIrector
Case Number: 1:2015cv00034
Filed: January 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for Summary Judgment by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/22/16. (pglov)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER granting 60 Motion to Amend Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/31/2016.(slibi, )
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/22/16. (msksec, )
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Recusal. by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/15/2016.(cthom, )
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 42 Motion to Amend Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/14/2016.(slibi, )
January 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER to draw by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/24/16. (dkals, )
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 11 Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel, 12 Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration, and 13 Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal without Prepayment of Costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/5/15.(dkals, )
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/23/15. (dkals, )
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/13/15. (morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Zimmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Kassety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver City Jail Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elias Diggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Health DIrector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?