Sardina et al v. Charles et al
Plaintiff: Marisol Sardina, Columba Rodriguez, Margarita Herrera, Margarita Lopez, Angelica Lugo, Blanca Avila, Jessica Morales Tavera, Patricia Alejandre Garcia, Maria Quinones, Rosaura Zavala and Alberto Echeverria
Defendant: Long Peak Arches Inc, McDonalds Corporation, Lorena Estrada, Cliff Pete, Robert F Charles and Mile High Drive-In Inc
Case Number: 1:2015cv00054
Filed: January 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 171 Unopposed Motion for Approval of Collective Action Settlement. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/20/2017. (athom, )
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MINUTE ORDER; 120 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order is GRANTED. Discovery deadline is extended to 4/12/2016, for the sole purpose of completing outstanding depositions in this case, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/1/16.(morti, )
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting 76 Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and for Judicial Notice to Class Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)B. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/29/2016.(cmira)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER; Defendant's 57 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and the Plaintiff's 74 Motion to Strike Defendants Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint [Doc. No. 72] Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d) and REB Civ. Practice Standard IV.C.1-3 are DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/17/16.(morti, )
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER That the parties Stipulation of Dismissal for Plaintiffs Colorado State Law Breach of Contract Claims Against All Defendants 114 , filed February 2, 2016 is approved; and That plaintiffs Colorado state law breach of contract claims agains t all defendants (the Seventh and Eighth Claims for Relief asserted in plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint 48 , filed June 16, 2015) are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs as to the dismissed claims, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/10/2016. (evana, )
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 89 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff, Margarita Lopez From This Case Without Prejudice, and the caption shall be amended accordingly, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/15/2015.(evana, )
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER approving 71 Stipulation of Dismissal for Plaintiffs' Colorado State Law Wage and Hour Claims Brought Pursuant to C.R.S. §§ 8-6-101 et seq. Against Defendants Lorena Estrada and Cliff Pete, Individually. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/10/2015. (mlace, )
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING F.R.E. 502(d) by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/20/15. (lgale, )
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TRIAL PREPARTATION CONFERENCE ORDER Dispositive Motions due by 2/29/2016. 10 day Jury Trial set for 8/22/2016 08:30 AM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/5/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/29/2015. (mlace, )
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER approving 40 Report and Recommendations, and granting 38 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/16/15.(dkals, )
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER dismissing with prejudice McDonalds Corporation by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/4/15. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sardina et al v. Charles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Sardina
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columba Rodriguez
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Herrera
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Lopez
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Lugo
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Avila
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Morales Tavera
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Alejandre Garcia
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Quinones
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosaura Zavala
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Echeverria
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Peak Arches Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonalds Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorena Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Pete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mile High Drive-In Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?