Seeger v. Medtronic USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Jillian Seeger |
Defendant: |
Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. and Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00117 |
Filed: |
January 16, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Boulder |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Watanabe |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury: Health Care |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 28, 2015 |
Filing
32
STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/28/15. (jdyne, )
|
April 21, 2015 |
Filing
27
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a 10 day Jury Trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on August 15, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for July 28, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. Please see the order for details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/21/2015. (rbjsec.)
|
March 11, 2015 |
Filing
22
ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set April 1, 2015 before Magistrate Judge Watanabe is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/11/2015. (rbjsec. )
|
January 20, 2015 |
Filing
7
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM. On or before 3/2/2015, parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form 6 . Consent Form due by 3/2/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/20/2015. (emill)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?