Rocky Mountain Wild Inc v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Wild Inc
Defendant: United States Forest Service and United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 1:2015cv00127
Filed: January 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 62 Motion for Ruling Regarding Third Party Contractor Records. The parties are ORDERED to file their settlement documents on or before February 28, 2017. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/27/2017. (cthom, )
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying as moot 19 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 36 and 38 Motions for Summary Judgment as indicated in the attached Order. Status Report due by 4/25/2016. By Judge William J. Martinez on 01/29/2016. (athom, )
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 5/26/2015. Granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. The defendant shall produce documents by this Friday, May 29, 2015 at 5:00 p.m. and shall produce documents every Friday thereafter. FTR: Courtroom A-402. (amont, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Mountain Wild Inc v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Wild Inc
Represented By: Matthew David Sandler
Represented By: Travis Earl Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Zeyen Julian Wu(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Zeyen Julian Wu(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?