Aronstein et al v. Thompson Creek Metals Company Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Aronstein and Lesley Stroll
Defendant: Thompson Creek Metals Company Inc., Kevin Loughrey, Pamela Saxton, Pamela Solly, James L Freer, James P. Geyer, Timothy J. Haddon, Carol T. Banducci, Thomas J. Oneil, Denis C. Arsenault and Wendy Cassity
Case Number: 1:2015cv00204
Filed: January 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Presiding Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2016 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support 79 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. A separate written order shall issue. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bsimm, )
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY-STORED INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/15/15. (bsimm, )
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference for 10/15/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties or their counsel shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 10/8/15. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/2/15. (nywlc1)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/15/15 re: Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery Pending A Decision on Their Motion to Dismiss 30 . The Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART and I ORDER certain discovery to proceed immediately. A Scheduling Conference will follow the Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (bsimm, )
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference and Motion Hearing held on 5/11/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Pending a Decision on Their Motion to Dismiss 30 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. A separate written order shall issue. Parties request oral argument on Defendants Motion to Dismiss 22 . Counsel will have to appear inperson for oral argument. The Court will work with counsel to set a date for oral argument at the beginning of June. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, )
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Reconsider and Vacate by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/31/15.(dkals, )
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER denying 35 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/23/2015.(tscha, )
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/9/15. A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bsimm, )
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/5/15 re: Defendants' Motion to Reconsider and Vacate the Court's March 3, 2015 Order Striking Defendants' February 13, 2015 Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, Motion Seeking Leave to File 39-Page Motion to Dismiss 19 . To the extent Defendants seek leave to file a 39-page Motion to Dismiss, the Motionis GRANTED for the reasons stated therein; and Defendants' Motion is DENIED as to all other matters. (bsimm, )
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER striking 13 Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/3/2015.(tscha, )
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffsAmended Complaint [Doc. #4] on or before February 13, 2015, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/03/15. (nmarb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aronstein et al v. Thompson Creek Metals Company Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Aronstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesley Stroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Creek Metals Company Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Represented By: Allison Kaye Kostecka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Loughrey
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Represented By: Allison Kaye Kostecka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Saxton
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Represented By: Allison Kaye Kostecka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Solly
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Represented By: Allison Kaye Kostecka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Freer
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Represented By: Allison Kaye Kostecka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Geyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Haddon
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Represented By: Allison Kaye Kostecka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol T. Banducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Oneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis C. Arsenault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Cassity
Represented By: Gregory J. Kerwin
Represented By: Allison Kaye Kostecka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?