Khoja et al v. DPD SUB, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mehb Khoja and Rodolfo Guizar Reyes
Defendant: DPD Sub, Inc. and DPI Sub, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00258
Filed: February 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that Defendants Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceeding and Compel Arbitration ECF No. 6 , is DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. It is FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 9 U.S.C. §§ 3-4, the parties s hall proceed with arbitration in accordance with the Franchise Agreement. This Court shall retain jurisdiction until arbitration has been completed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that since the length of the arbitration process is uncertain, I find that t his case should be administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 with leave to be reopened for good cause shown. If no action is taken to reopen this case before September 18, 2016, the case will be dismissed without prejudice without any further notice to either party. by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/29/2015.(evana, )
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER; 18 Unopposed Motion for Stay is GRANTED. All discovery and other proceedings are STAYED pending ruling on Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration. The parties shall file a Status Report with the court to advise whether the stay should be lifted and the scheduling deadlines reset no later than 10 days after ruling on the Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/22/15.(morti, )
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/7/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/10/15. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khoja et al v. DPD SUB, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehb Khoja
Represented By: Paul Matthew Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Guizar Reyes
Represented By: Paul Matthew Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPD Sub, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Paul Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPI Sub, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Paul Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?