Thornton v. Goodrich et al
Petitioner: Richard Thornton
Respondent: Barry Goodrich and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2015cv00432
Filed: March 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Las Animas
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. ORDERED that Applicant's Motion for Waiver of PACER Research Fees 34 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/09/17. (jhawk, )
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 15 Motion for Reconsideration for Certificate of Appealability by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/15/15.(dkals, )
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/13/15. There is no basis on which to issue a certificate of appealability. (dkals, )
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/12/2015. (slibi, )
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/03/2015. (slibi, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Goodrich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Barry Goodrich
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?