Smith v. Town of Kremmling, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: |
Robert Mark Smith |
Defendant: |
Town of Kremmling, Colorado, Robert Dillon, Todd Wilson, Daniel Mayer, Zachary Luchs, Mike Reed, Scott Spade and Scott (I) Spade |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00459 |
Filed: |
March 4, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Grand |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard P. Matsch |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 3, 2016 |
Filing
24
ORDER Granting 23 Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend the Scheduling Order Deadlines. The discovery cutoff is extended to May 20, 2016; The dispositive motions deadline is extended to June 20, 2016; The parties shall designate all contradicting experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2) by April 8, 2016; The parties shall offer any rebuttal opinions by April 22, 2016. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/3/2016.(evana, )
|
January 15, 2016 |
Filing
22
ORDER Granting 21 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The party bearing the burden of persuasion on issues for which expert opinion is to be offered shall designate the expert and provide opposing counsel with all info rmation specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before February 12, 2016. The parties shall designate all contradicting experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before March 11, 2016, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/15/16. (ktera)
|
July 22, 2015 |
Filing
20
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/22/2015. (ebuch)
|
June 30, 2015 |
Filing
16
ORDER Granting 15 Motion for Leave to Permit Co-Lead Counsel to Appear at the Scheduling Conference. Ms. Pratt may appear at the Scheduling Conference on July 22, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. in lieu of Mr. Marks, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/30/2015. (ktera)
|
June 4, 2015 |
Filing
14
ORDER Scheduling conference will be held on July 22, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be sub mitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on July 16, 2015. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/4/15. (ktera)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?