Edwards v. Pilatus Aircraft, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Edwards
Defendant: Pilatus Aircraft, Ltd., Pilatus Business Aircraft, Ltd., Honeywell International Inc., Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., Glenair, Inc. and Epps Air Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00567
Filed: March 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Coordinate 58 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/15/16.(jhawk, )
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Compel and/or Permit Testing, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/12/2015.(slibi, )
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING PRESERVATION OF AIRCRAFT WRECKAGE, entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/22/2015. (emill)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. and Epps Air Service Inc. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants Epps Air Service, Inc., and Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. [ 50] is GRANTED. ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all claims asserted against defendants Rosemount Aerospace, Inc., d/b/a Goodrich Sensor Systems, and Epps Air Service, Inc., d/b/a Epps Aviation, Inc., are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 07/22/15.(jhawk, )
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM. On or before 4/30/2015, parties shall complete and file Pilot Program Consent Form 17 . Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2015 1 0:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Denying without prejudice 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery. Denying without prejudice 5 Plaintiff's Second Alternative Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue. Counsel shall comply with First and Final Notice to Nonadmitted Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases (Docket No. 10) as well as the First and Final Notice to [Admitted] Attorney (s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases (Docket No. 7). Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to the attorneys who have yet to enter an appearance. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/25/2015.(emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Pilatus Aircraft, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Edwards
Represented By: Barry Edward Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilatus Aircraft, Ltd.
Represented By: Bruce J. Berman
Represented By: Jaret Joseph Fuente
Represented By: David Lanier Luck
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilatus Business Aircraft, Ltd.
Represented By: Bruce J. Berman
Represented By: Jaret Joseph Fuente
Represented By: David Lanier Luck
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Steven Lee Boldt
Represented By: Michael G. McQuillen
Represented By: Christopher J. Raistrick
Represented By: Todd Matthew Saranecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemount Aerospace, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Byrne
Represented By: Kevin Richard Kennedy
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Nicola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenair, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Ollar Entrican
Represented By: Mary Alice Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epps Air Service, Inc.
Represented By: John Arthur Mozley
Represented By: Arthur James Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?