Blankenship v. Golden Rule Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: |
Alia Blankenship |
Defendant: |
Golden Rule Insurance Company, United Healthcare, Inc. and Vimo, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00578 |
Filed: |
March 20, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard P. Matsch |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 9, 2016 |
Filing
39
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE The above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall pay his or her own respective attorney's fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/9/16. (ktera)
|
October 20, 2015 |
Filing
31
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER 30 The First Amended Answer attached thereto is accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/20/15. (ktera)
|
October 14, 2015 |
Filing
29
PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Plaintiff, Alia Blankenship and Defendants, Golden Rule Insurance Company and Vimo, Inc., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/14/15. (ktera)
|
September 24, 2015 |
Filing
27
ORDER Pursuant to Procedural Order Number One 24 , a scheduling conference will be held on October 30, 2015, at 3:30 p.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The pro posed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on October 20, 2015. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/24/15. (ktera)
|
August 10, 2015 |
Filing
24
PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26(f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A) shall be made within 14 days after that conference. The proposed discovery plan will be in the form of the Scheduling Order which will be submitted to chambers in paper form 10 days before the date of the Scheduling Conference. Counsel for the plaintiff will telephone chambers within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/10/15. (ktera)
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing
20
ORDER Granting 18 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss United Healthcare, Inc. without Prejudice and to Amend Her Complaint to Add Claims and Averments against the Remaining Defendants. Plaintiff shall file a clean copy of the Second Amended Complaint on or before July 24, 2015, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/20/15. (ktera)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?