Fortner v. County of El Paso, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Fortner and Darrell Fortner
Defendant: County of El Paso, Colorado, State of Colorado, Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protection District, Terry Maketa, Terry (I) Maketa, Scott Campbell, Scott (I) Campbell, Bob Harvey, Bob (I) Harvey, James Rebitski, James (I) Rebitski, Edwan Bracken, Edwan (I) Bracken, Rick McMorran, Rick (I) McMorran, Diana May, Diana (I) May, Preston Cooper, Preston (I) Cooper, Darrel Glenn, Darrel (I) Glenn, Amy Folsom, Amy (I) Folsom, Andrew Gorgey, Andrew (I) Gorgey, Jon Mueller, Jon (I) Mueller, Michael Shelburne, Michael (I) Shelburne, John Hickenlooper, John (I) Hickenlooper, El Paso County Board of County Commissioners, Dennis (I) Hasley, Dennis Hasley, Peggy (I) Littleton, Peggy Littleton, Sallie (I) Clark, Sallie Clark, Amy (I) Lathen and Amy Lathen
Case Number: 1:2015cv00644
Filed: March 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 FINAL JUDGMENT. re #67 , by clerk on 3/2/2016. (dhans, )
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATIONS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS, #62 , #52 , #57 , #31 , #32 , #34 , by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/2/2016.(dhans, )
February 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objection to Recommendation by Defendants Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protection District, Edwan Bracken, Edwan (I) Bracken, Preston Cooper, Preston (I) Cooper, Bob Harvey, Bob (I) Harvey, Rick McMorran, Rick (I) McMorran. (Dale, Gillian)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER striking Plaintiff's Reply to County Defendants Response Doc. No. 63 #64 . Plaintiff's Reply is STRICKEN given this Court's Revised Practice Standard III.C.2 which clearly states "In conformity with Rule 72, no reply brief in support of an objection will be accepted.". SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 02/12/2016. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STRICKEN REPLY to #63 Defendant's Response to #62 Plaintiff's Objection to #57 Report and Recommendations, filed by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (cthom, ) Modified to show STRICKEN on 2/16/2016 (cthom, ).
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE to Objection to #57 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #7 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Darrell Fortner filed by Defendants Scott Campbell, Scott (I) Campbell, Sallie (I) Clark, Sallie Clark, County of El Paso, Colorado, El Paso County Board of County Commissioners, Amy Folsom, Amy (I) Folsom, Darrel Glenn, Darrel (I) Glenn, Andrew Gorgey, Andrew (I) Gorgey, Dennis Hasley, Dennis (I) Hasley, Amy Lathen, Amy (I) Lathen, Peggy Littleton, Peggy (I) Littleton, Terry Maketa, Terry (I) Maketa, Diana May, Diana (I) May, Jon Mueller, Jon (I) Mueller, Michael Shelburne, Michael (I) Shelburne. (Hodges, Kenneth)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OBJECTION to #52 and #57 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cthom, ) Modified to add docket entry relationship on 2/16/2016 (cthom, ).
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Show Cause Response Deadline pursuant to NYW Chambers instructions. Text Only Entry (jhawk, )
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part #58 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extinsion (sic) of Time to File Objections to the Magratstrates' (sic) Recommdations (sic). The Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED IN PART, for good cause shown. Plaintiff's deadline to file his Responses to BOTH of the Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge #52 and #57 is extended up to and including January 29, 2016. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS TO FILE THESE RESPONSES WILL BE GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 01/21/2016. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE re #58 MOTION for Extension of Time to by Defendants Scott Campbell, El Paso County Board of County Commissioners, Amy Folsom, Dennis Hasley, Amy Lathen, Peggy Littleton, Terry Maketa, Diana (I) May, Rick McMorran, Jon Mueller, Michael Shelburne (Hodges, Kenneth)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extinsion (sic) of Time to File Objections to the Magratstrates' Recommdations (sic), by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmarb, )
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/4/16. I respectfully RECOMMEND that: The Amended Complaint #7 be DISMISSED as to Defendant James Rebitski for failure to prosecute and failure to timely effect service of process as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, or in the alternative, for the reasons as set forth in the Recommendation dated December 9, 2015 #52 ; and The civil action be DISMISSED in its entirety. (bsimm, )
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Recommendations. Plaintiff is granted leave, for good cause shown, to file said Objections on or before January 19, 2016. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/21/2015. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION for Extinsion (sic) of Time to File Objections to the Magratstrates' Recommdations (sic), by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (nmarb, )
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #52 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John (I) Hickenlooper, State of Colorado, John Hickenlooper, #32 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by P, #53 Order to Show Cause, mailed to: Darrell Fortner, 13330 Holmes Rd, Colorado Springs, CO, 80908. (cthom, )
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall show cause in writing and on or before 12/23/15 why this case should not be dismissed as to Defendant Rebitski for failure to prosecute and failure to timely effect service of process as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff shall further show cause in writing and on or before 12/23/15, why this case should not be dismissed as to Defendant Rebitski based on the analysis set forth in this court's Recommendation #52 that the BFPD's Motion to Dismiss be granted. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/9/15. (nywlc1)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that the following Motions to Dismiss be GRANTED: #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Hickenlooper, State of Colorado; #32 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Preston Cooper, Rick McMorran, Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protection District, Bob Harvey, Edwan Bracken; and #31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Michael Shelburne, Amy Lathen, Peggy Littleton, Terry Maketa, Jon Mueller, El Paso County Board of County Commissioners, Andrew Gorgey, Dennis Hasley, Darrel Glenn, Scott Campbell, Sallie Clark, Diana May, County of El Paso, Colorado, Amy Folsom. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/9/15. (Attachments: #(1) Appendix, #(2) Appendix, #(3) Appendix)(nywlc1)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (nmarb, )
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner (cthom, )
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY to Response to #32 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protection District, Edwan Bracken, Edwan (I) Bracken, Preston Cooper, Preston (I) Cooper, Bob Harvey, Bob (I) Harvey, Rick McMorran, Rick (I) McMorran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dale, Gillian)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/2/15 re: Plaintiff's Supplement to Response County and Fire District Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #46 . The Supplement #46 is STRICKEN; and should Plaintiff wish to supplement his Response or substitute a second Response in place of the original, he shall file a Motion pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(c) or (d) that complies with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a).(bsimm, )
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY to Response to #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants John Hickenlooper, John (I) Hickenlooper, State of Colorado. (Spalding, Kathleen)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STRICKEN ON 6/2/2015- SUPPLEMENT to #37 Response to Motion County and Fire Dispatch, by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5-1 (Best Copy), #2 Exhibit 5-2 (Best Copy), #3 Exhibit 6-3, #4 Exhibit 6-4, #5 Exhibit 6-5, #6 Exhibit 6-6)(evana, ) Modified on 6/2/2015 to add STRIKE(bsimm, ).
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM regarding #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John (I) Hickenlooper, State of Colorado, John Hickenlooper, #32 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Preston Cooper, Rick McMorran, Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protection District, Preston (I) Cooper, Bob Harvey, Edwan Bracken, Rick (I) McMorran, Bob (I) Harvey, Edwan (I) Bracken, #31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Michael Shelburne, Amy Lathen, Peggy (I) Littleton, Terry (I) Maketa, Amy (I) Lathen, Michael (I) Shelburne, Jon (I) Mueller, El Paso County Board of County Commissioners, Andrew (I) Gorgey, Dennis Hasley, Darrel (I) Glenn, Scott Campbell, Sallie Clark, Sallie (I) Clark, Diana (I) May, Andrew Gorgey, Amy Folsom, Diana May, County of El Paso, Colorado, Jon Mueller, Peggy Littleton, Amy (I) Folsom, Terry Maketa, Scott (I) Campbell, Darrel Glenn, Dennis (I) Hasley. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/22/2015. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/22/2015. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY to Response to #31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Scott Campbell, Scott (I) Campbell, Sallie (I) Clark, Sallie Clark, County of El Paso, Colorado, El Paso County Board of County Commissioners, Amy Folsom, Amy (I) Folsom, Darrel Glenn, Darrel (I) Glenn, Andrew Gorgey, Andrew (I) Gorgey, Dennis Hasley, Dennis (I) Hasley, Amy Lathen, Amy (I) Lathen, Peggy Littleton, Peggy (I) Littleton, Terry Maketa, Terry (I) Maketa, Diana May, Diana (I) May, Jon Mueller, Jon (I) Mueller, Michael Shelburne, Michael (I) Shelburne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hodges, Kenneth)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was was drawn in error. It has been assigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 15-cv-00644-WJM-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #40 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Consent not achieved. This case is reassigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch. All future pleadings should be designated as 15-cv-00644-RPM-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants John Hickenlooper, John (I) Hickenlooper, State of Colorado Consent not achieved by parties.. (Spalding, Kathleen)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #31 County Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Response)(nmarb, )
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #34 States Defendants MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Response, #2 Exhibits to Response, #3 Exhibits to Response)(nmarb, )
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #32 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendant Black Forest Fire/Protection District, filed by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (nmarb, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2015: #1 Exhibits to Response #2 Exhibits to Response) (nmarb, ). Modified on 5/20/2015 to expand on exhibits description. (nmarb, ).
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner only. (nmarb, )
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/13/15. In light of the filing of the First Amended Complaint, the following Motions are DENIED AS MOOT: The District's Motion to Dismiss #5 ; The County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #6 ; Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss #8 ; and Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss #12 . (bsimm, )
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants John Hickenlooper, John (I) Hickenlooper, State of Colorado. (Spalding, Kathleen)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/12/15 re: Defendants' Unopposed Joint Motion to Stay Disclosures and Discovery and Request to Vacate Scheduling Conference #30 . The Motion is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2015 is VACATED. (bsimm, )
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protecton District, Edwan Bracken, Edwan (I) Bracken, Preston Cooper, Preston (I) Cooper, Bob Harvey, Bob (I) Harvey, Rick McMorran, Rick (I) McMorran. (Dale, Gillian)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants Scott Campbell, Scott (I) Campbell, Sallie (I) Clark, Sallie Clark, County of El Paso, Colorado, El Paso Cunty Board of County Commissioners, Amy Folsom, Amy (I) Folsom, Darrel Glenn, Darrel (I) Glenn, Andrew Gorgey, Andrew (I) Gorgey, Dennis Hasley, Dennis (I) Hasley, Amy Lathen, Amy (I) Lathen, Peggy Littleton, Peggy (I) Littleton, Terry Maketa, Terry (I) Maketa, Diana May, Diana (I) May, Jon Mueller, Jon (I) Mueller, Michael Shelburne, Michael (I) Shelburne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hodges, Kenneth)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Stay Disclosures and Discovery and Request to Vacate Scheduling Cnference by Defendants Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protecton District, Edwan Bracken, Edwan (I) Bracken, Scott Campbell, Scott (I) Campbell, Sallie (I) Clark, Sallie Clark, Preston Cooper, Preston (I) Cooper, County of El Paso, Colorado, El Paso Cunty Board of County Commissioners, Amy Folsom, Amy (I) Folsom, Darrel Glenn, Darrel (I) Glenn, Andrew Gorgey, Andrew (I) Gorgey, Bob Harvey, Bob (I) Harvey, Dennis Hasley, Dennis (I) Hasley, John Hickenlooper, John (I) Hickenlooper, Amy Lathen, Amy (I) Lathen, Peggy Littleton, Peggy (I) Littleton, Terry Maketa, Terry (I) Maketa, Diana May, Diana (I) May, Rick McMorran, Rick (I) McMorran, Jon Mueller, Jon (I) Mueller, James Rebitski, James (I) Rebitski, Michael Shelburne, Michael (I) Shelburne, State of Colorado. (Hodges, Kenneth)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/6/15 granting #28 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the May 28, 2015 Scheduling Conference. Plaintiff shall contact Chambers at 303.335.2600 at the designated time. (bsimm, )
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Plaintiffs MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form, by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Terry Maketa served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015; Terry (I) Maketa served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Scott Campbell served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015; Scott (I) Campbell served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Rick McMorran served on 3/30/2015, answer due 4/20/2015; Rick (I) McMorran served on 3/30/2015, answer due 4/20/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Preston Cooper served on 3/30/2015, answer due 4/20/2015; Preston (I) Cooper served on 3/30/2015, answer due 4/20/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Michael Shelburne served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015; Michael (I) Shelburne served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Jon Mueller served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015; Jon (I) Mueller served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. John Hickenlooper served on 4/23/2015, answer due 5/14/2015; John (I) Hickenlooper served on 4/23/2015, answer due 5/14/2015; State of Colorado served on 4/23/2015, answer due 5/14/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Edwan Bracken served on 4/3/2015, answer due 4/24/2015; Edwan (I) Bracken served on 4/3/2015, answer due 4/24/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Diana May served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015; Diana (I) May served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Darrel Glenn served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015; Darrel (I) Glenn served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. County of El Paso, Colorado served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Bob Harvey served on 4/9/2015, answer due 4/30/2015; Bob (I) Harvey served on 4/9/2015, answer due 4/30/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protecton District served on 3/30/2015, answer due 4/20/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Andrew Gorgey served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015; Andrew (I) Gorgey served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Fortner. Amy Folsom served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015; Amy (I) Folsom served on 3/31/2015, answer due 4/21/2015. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Plaintiffs MOTION to Dismiss Does 1 - 500 Without Prejudice, by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (nmarb, )
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kenneth Richard Hodges on behalf of Scott Campbell, Scott (I) Campbell, Sallie (I) Clark, Sallie Clark, County of El Paso, Colorado, El Paso Cunty Board of County Commissioners, Amy Folsom, Amy (I) Folsom, Darrel Glenn, Darrel (I) Glenn, Andrew Gorgey, Andrew (I) Gorgey, Dennis (I) Hasley, Amy Lathen, Amy (I) Lathen, Peggy Littleton, Peggy (I) Littleton, Terry Maketa, Terry (I) Maketa, Diana May, Diana (I) May, Jon Mueller, Jon (I) Mueller, Michael Shelburne, Michael (I) ShelburneAttorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Sallie (I) Clark(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Sallie Clark (pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party El Paso Cunty Board of County Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Dennis (I) Hasley(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Amy Lathen(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Amy (I) Lathen(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Peggy Littleton(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Peggy (I) Littleton(pty:dft) (Hodges, Kenneth)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/29/15. Consent Form due by 5/21/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2015 10:15 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (bsimm, )
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathleen L. Spalding on behalf of John Hickenlooper, John (I) Hickenlooper, State of ColoradoAttorney Kathleen L. Spalding added to party John Hickenlooper(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen L. Spalding added to party John (I) Hickenlooper(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen L. Spalding added to party State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Spalding, Kathleen)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Does 1-500 Without Prejudice, by Plaintiff Darrell Fortner. (nmarb, )
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT 42 USCS 1983 against Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protecton District, Edwan Bracken, Edwan (I) Bracken, Scott Campbell, Scott (I) Campbell, Sallie (I) Clark, Sallie Clark, Preston Cooper, Preston (I) Cooper, County of El Paso, Colorado, El Paso Cunty Board of County Commissioners, Amy Folsom, Amy (I) Folsom, Darrel Glenn, Darrel (I) Glenn, Andrew Gorgey, Andrew (I) Gorgey, Bob Harvey, Bob (I) Harvey, Dennis Hasley, Dennis (I) Hasley, John Hickenlooper, John (I) Hickenlooper, Amy Lathen, Amy (I) Lathen, Peggy Littleton, Peggy (I) Littleton, Terry Maketa, Terry (I) Maketa, Diana May, Diana (I) May, Rick McMorran, Rick (I) McMorran, Jon Mueller, Jon (I) Mueller, James Rebitski, James (I) Rebitski, Michael Shelburne, Michael (I) Shelburne, State of Colorado, filed by Darrell Fortner.(nmarb, )
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Scott Campbell, Scott (I) Campbell, County of El Paso, Colorado, Amy Folsom, Amy (I) Folson, Darrel Glenn, Darrel (I) Glenn, Andrew Gorgey, Andrew (I) Gorgey, Terry Maketa, Terry (I) Maketa, Diana May, Diana (I) May, Jon Mueller, Jon (I) Mueller, Michael Shelburne, Michael (I) Shelburne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hodges, Kenneth)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protecton District. (Dale, Gillian)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kenneth Richard Hodges on behalf of Scott Campbell, Scott (I) Campbell, County of El Paso, Colorado, Amy Folsom, Amy (I) Folson, Darrel Glenn, Darrel (I) Glenn, Andrew Gorgey, Andrew (I) Gorgey, Terry Maketa, Terry (I) Maketa, Diana May, Diana (I) May, Rick McMorran, Rick (I) McMorran, Jon Mueller, Jon (I) Mueller, Michael Shelburne, Michael (I) ShelburneAttorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Scott Campbell(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Scott (I) Campbell(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party County of El Paso, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Amy Folsom(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Amy (I) Folson(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Darrel Glenn(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Darrel (I) Glenn(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Andrew Gorgey(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Andrew (I) Gorgey(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Terry Maketa(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Terry (I) Maketa(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Diana May(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Diana (I) May(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Rick McMorran(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Rick (I) McMorran(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Jon Mueller(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Jon (I) Mueller(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Michael Shelburne(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Richard Hodges added to party Michael (I) Shelburne(pty:dft) (Hodges, Kenneth)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Magistrate Judge Pilot Project to Assign Civil Cases to Full Time Magistrate Judges. Summonses and Consent Form issued to filer in paper format. Text Only Entry. (dbera, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang Text Only Entry (dbera, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Verified Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protecton District, Edwan Bracken, Edwan (I) Bracken, Scott Campbell, Scott (I) Campbell, Preston Cooper, Preston (I) Cooper, County of El Paso, Colorado, Amy Folsom, Amy (I) Folson, Darrel Glenn, Darrel (I) Glenn, Andrew Gorgey, Andrew (I) Gorgey, Bob Harvey, Bob (I) Harvey, John Hickenlooper, John (I) Hickenlooper, Terry Maketa, Terry (I) Maketa, Diana May, Diana (I) May, Rick McMorran, Rick (I) McMorran, Jon Mueller, Jon (I) Mueller, James Rebitski, James (I) Rebitski, Michael Shelburne, Michael (I) Shelburne, State of Colorado Filing Fee: $400.00Receipt Number:67843, filed by Darrell Fortner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortner v. County of El Paso, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of El Paso, Colorado
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado
Represented By: Kathleen L. Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Forest Fire/Rescue Protection District
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Maketa
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry (I) Maketa
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Campbell
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott (I) Campbell
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Harvey
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob (I) Harvey
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rebitski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) Rebitski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwan Bracken
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwan (I) Bracken
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick McMorran
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick (I) McMorran
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana May
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana (I) May
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Cooper
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston (I) Cooper
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Glenn
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel (I) Glenn
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Folsom
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy (I) Folsom
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Gorgey
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew (I) Gorgey
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Mueller
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon (I) Mueller
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shelburne
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael (I) Shelburne
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hickenlooper
Represented By: Kathleen L. Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Hickenlooper
Represented By: Kathleen L. Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis (I) Hasley
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Hasley
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy (I) Littleton
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Littleton
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie (I) Clark
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Clark
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy (I) Lathen
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Lathen
Represented By: Kenneth Richard Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Fortner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?