Tennyson v. Raemisch et al

Plaintiff: Audrey L. Tennyson
Defendant: Rick Raemisch, Michael Miller, Melinda McMillan, Louis Cabling, Judy Brezendine, Laurie Knapp and Doug Roberts
Case Number: 1:2015cv00707
Filed: April 3, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 136 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 102 Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying 105 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/14/17. (dkals, )
April 6, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/6/16. (msksec, )
February 25, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RECOMMENDATIONS: The Court ADOPTS the Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge ( 64 , 65 , 66 , and 67 ) which now become the Orders of the Court. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/24/16.(msksec, )
November 2, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 11/2/2015. Denying without prejudice 25 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Injunctive Relief and for Designated Defendant� 39;s [sic] to Show Cause.The Court will issue written recommendations as to pending motions discussed on the record 46 54 30 and 33 . An expedited transcript shall be provided to Plaintiff. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A402. (emill)
May 5, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 15 Motion to Alter or Amend the Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/5/15.(dkals, )
April 17, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/17/15.(dkals, )
April 7, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/7/15. (nmarb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennyson v. Raemisch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey L. Tennyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raemisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Miller
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda McMillan
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Cabling
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Brezendine
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Knapp
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?