United States v. Armbruster
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Mark Armbruster
Case Number: 1:2015cv00733
Filed: April 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:3001 - Federal Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/29/15. The Motion to Dismiss 12 is GRANTED; and this case is dismissed without prejudice. (bsimm, )
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/22/15 GRANTING 7 Unopposed Motion to Reopen Administratively Closed Case. Consent Form due by 1/5/2016. Status Report due by 1/5/2016.(nmarb, )
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/27/15 re: Unopposed Motion for Order to Administratively Close Case and Vacate Status Conference 5 . The Motion is GRANTED. This case is administratively closed. The Parties are directed to file a Status Report within ten days of consolidation of Defendant Mark Armbruster's student loans. (bsimm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Armbruster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Armbruster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?