September 21, 2018 |
Filing
216
ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 204 is ACCEPTED. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 205 is ACCEPTED. Motion for Summary Judgment From Defendants Susan Tiona, Karen Mitchell, David Gross, Richard M adrid, and Desiree Andrews 157 is GRANTED. Motion for Summary Judgment 166 is GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), plaintiff's claims against defendants Jerry Steele, Patricia Headley, L. Mortin-Earl, and Kathy M. Wiley, NP, are DIS MISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's Rebuttal to Defendants [sic] Objections/Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents 200 and Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants [sic] Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff' ;s Production of Documents 201 , construed as objections to the magistrate judge's February 23, 2018 Protective Order [189-190], are OVERRULED as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Review of Plaintiffs Rebuttal to Defendants [sic] Objection t o Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents (P.O.D.) on 03/23/2018, Also Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants [sic] Protective Order Regarding His Production of Documents Motion on 03/23/2018 211 is DENIED as moot. Judgment shall en ter against plaintiff Mark Walter Paulsen and in favor of defendants Susan Tiona, Karen C. Mitchell, David R. Gross, Richard Madrid, Desiree Andrews, and Doug Roberts. Within 14 days of the entry of this Order, defendants may have their costs by filing a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of the Court. This case is closed, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/21/18. (sgrim)
|
March 1, 2018 |
Filing
191
ORDER Accepting Magistrate Judge's Recommendation by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/01/2018, re: 186 Report and Recommendations; and denying 152 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (sphil, )
|
November 21, 2017 |
Filing
175
ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RECOMMENDATION by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/21/2017, re: 169 The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted, re: 117 Plaintiffs Motion, Requesting a Court Oder Allowing Plaintiff, Paulsen to Excersize [sic] His Right to Petition the Government for Redress of Grievances in the CDOC (SCF) Law-Library is denied. (sphil, )
|
October 6, 2015 |
Filing
54
ORDER; 49 Defendants Andersons, Robertss, and ONeils Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Discovery in this matter is STAYED. The October 14, 2015, scheduling conference is VACATED and will be reset a fter this courts recommendation on the Defendants Motions to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/6/15.(morti, ) (Main Document 54 replaced on 10/6/2015) (morti, ). Modified on 10/6/2015 to replace document with judicial officer's signature (morti, ).
|
September 16, 2015 |
Filing
46
ORDER Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference for 10/14/2015 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Plaintiff, or his/her case manager, shall arrange for his/her participation via telephone and shall call (303) 335-2780 at the scheduled time, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/16/15. (sgrim, )
|
July 21, 2015 |
Filing
22
MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 21 Petition to Amend Parties to Case Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 is DENIED without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/21/15.(morti, )
|
July 6, 2015 |
Filing
12
ORDER to Draw in Part and to Dismiss in Part by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/6/15: Defendants Joe Ortiz, Rick Raemisch, John Suthers, Tom Clements/Estate of Tom Clements, Roger Werholtz, Aristedes Zavaras, Tony Carochi and Wendy Kelso are dismissed. (dkals, )
|
April 18, 2015 |
Filing
6
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 04/18/15, To Plaintiff to Amend. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for the Appointment of Counsel, ECF No.4, will be denied as premature. (nmarb, )
|