Houck v. No Named Defendants
Plaintiff: Kenneth Houck
Defendant: No Named Defendants
Case Number: 1:2015cv00894
Filed: April 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 121 Motion to Stay by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/16/2017. (jgonz, )
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/19/15. (dkals, )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/9/15. (dkals, )
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to Amend by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/2/15. (dkals, )
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/28/15. (morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houck v. No Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?