Thomas et al v. Mayor, et al

Plaintiff: Catrice Thomas and Estate of Martel Thomas
Defendant: Mayor for the City and County of Denver, Colorado, Executive Director of the Department of Public Safety for the City & County of Denver, Colorado, John Doe(s) and Jane Doe(s)
Case Number: 1:2015cv00906
Filed: April 28, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion for Reconsideration by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/9/2016.(mdave, )
January 11, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 36 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and the remaining claims are remanded to the District Court for Denver County, Colorado where Plaintiffs initiated case number 2014CV34470, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/11/2016. (slibi, )
October 7, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/07/2015.(slibi, )
October 6, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 28 Motion to Clarify by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/06/2015.(mdave, )
July 29, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/29/2015.(slibi, )
July 7, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Designate Non-Parties at Fault, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/07/2015. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Denver Defendants' Designation of Non-Parties at Fault Pursuant to C.R.S. § 13-21-111.5(3)(b), located at docket #21-1. (slibi, )
May 7, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/07/15 granting 15 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery. A temporary stay of discovery is hereby imposed pending resolution of the Defendants motion to dismiss. The Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for June 3, 2015 is vacated. The parties shall file a status report within five (5) days of any order resolving their motion to dismiss.(nmarb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Mayor, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catrice Thomas
Represented By: Michael Donivan Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Martel Thomas
Represented By: Michael Donivan Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor for the City and County of Denver, Colorado
Represented By: Hollie Renee Birkholz
Represented By: Evan P. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Director of the Department of Public Safety for the City & County of Denver, Colorado
Represented By: Hollie Renee Birkholz
Represented By: Evan P. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?