Williams-Berrien v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: |
Derick Lamar Williams-Berrien |
Defendant: |
David Wilson, Gary Oliver, Robert Petree, Dan Oates, City of Aurora, The, Aurora Police Department, Dan (I) Oates, Gary (I) Oliver, Robert (I) Petree and David (I) Wilson |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00948 |
Filed: |
May 4, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Fremont |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert E. Blackburn |
Presiding Judge: |
Kristen L. Mix |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 13, 2018 |
Filing
140
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/13/18 re 125 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that the Motion 125 be DENIED. (lgale, )
|
November 3, 2015 |
Filing
37
MINUTE ORDER; This matter is before the Court on the Court's Order Allowing Amendment and Order to Show Cause 32 and on Plaintiffs Motion to Notify and Request for Continuance 34 . The Court has also reviewed Plaintiffs Letter 35 , dated O ctober 19, 2015, and filed with the Court on October 30, 2015. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause [#32] is DISCHARGED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion [#34] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to Plaintiff a printed copy of the electronic docket, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/3/15.(morti, )
|
October 13, 2015 |
Filing
32
ORDER Allowing Amendment and Order to Show Cause; 27 Plaintiffs Opposed Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to accept the Amended Complaint [#27-2] for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. 17 Joint Motion to Dismiss the Complaint is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before November 13, 2015, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing and filed on the docket, as to why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to comply with the Local Rules and to prosecute this lawsuit. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will result in a recommendation that Plaintiffs lawsuit be dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond tothe Amended Complaint [#27-2] fourteen (14) days after Plaintiff provides an updated address with the Court, if Plaintiff does so, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/13/15.(morti, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?