Sanchez et al v. Simply Right, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Aurelio Sanchez, Domingo Sanchez, Daniel Hernandez, Miguel Angel Godoy, Jose Luis Arreola, Benita Arreola and Clara Arreola
Defendant: Simply Right, Inc., Cinemark USA, Inc., Daniel Kilgore and Beatrice Perman
Case Number: 1:2015cv00974
Filed: May 7, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2017 174 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 121 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION, and 149 MOTION to Strike 121 Ex. 2-5; 121 Ex. 7; 121 Ex. 8; 121 Ex. 11 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/13/2017. The Court respectfully recommends that Plaintiffs Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification [filed 11/9/2016; ECF No. 121] be granted in part and denied in part as set forth herein, and Defendants Motion to Strike or Disregard Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Conditional Certification [filed 1/20/2017; ECF No. 149] be denied. (mdave, )
February 27, 2017 168 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that Defendant Cinemark USA, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment 123 be denied, and Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Cinemark USA, Inc.'s Status as a Joint Employer 134 be denied without prejudice as to the relief sought by the stayed Plaintiffs and the class and, otherwise, denied, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/27/17. (sgrim)
April 25, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 80 Unopposed Motion for Leave for Plaintiff Domingo Sanchez to Appear Telephonically at the Settlement Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/25/2016.(slibi, )
March 1, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 64 Motion to Compel; granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Motion Hearing held on 3/1/2016. Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/9/2016 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
October 15, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/15/2015. (mdave, )
October 8, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 44 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/8/2015.(mdave, )
August 24, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Stipulated Motion to Stay Claims of Certain Plaintiffs Pending Arbitration. Joint Status Report due on the first day of every month, beginning 10/1/2015. ORDER denying as moot as to Plaintiffs Domingo Sanchez and Daniel Hernandez and denying without prejudice as to Plaintiff Jose Luis Areola 13 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Strike Collective Active Claims, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/24/2015.(slibi, )
July 9, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 19 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/09/2015.(slibi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez et al v. Simply Right, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelio Sanchez
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domingo Sanchez
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hernandez
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Godoy
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Arreola
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benita Arreola
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Arreola
Represented By: Brandt Powers Milstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simply Right, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cinemark USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kilgore
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatrice Perman
Represented By: Jennifer S. Harpole
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?