Bank of Utah, not in its individual capacity but solely as Owner Trustee of The 198 Trust Agreement dated December 15, 2010, and any Amendments thereto, The v. CAAMS, LLC
Plaintiff: Bank of Utah, not in its individual capacity but solely as Owner Trustee of The 198 Trust Agreement dated December 15, 2010, and any Amendments thereto, The
Defendant: CAAMS, LLC and Everette C. Mash, III
Case Number: 1:2015cv01037
Filed: May 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ORDER OF JUDGMENT regarding 19 MOTION for Default Judgment. Judgment shall be entered against Defendant Everette C. Mash III and Defendant CAAMS, LLC, jointly and severally, and shall be in the sum certain amount of $4,812,228.52, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/25/2015. (ebuch)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF JUDGMENT regarding 19 MOTION for Default Judgment. Judgment shall be entered against Defendant Everette C. Mash III and Defendant CAAMS, LLC, jointly and severally, and shall be in the sum certain amount of $4,812,228.50, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/24/2015. (ebuch)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 COURTROOM MINUTES for Hearing on Damages held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/19/2015. Granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against All Defendants. Default judgment shall enter against defendants in the amount of $4,812,228.52. Counsel shall submit a proposed order consistent with those numbers. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (ebuch)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/25/15 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form. Consent Form due by 7/9/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of Utah, not in its individual capacity but solely as Owner Trustee of The 198 Trust Agreement dated December 15, 2010, and any Amendments thereto, The v. CAAMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of Utah, not in its individual capacity but solely as Owner Trustee of The 198 Trust Agreement dated December 15, 2010, and any Amendments thereto, The
Represented By: Emanuel N. Anton
Represented By: Jon Jay Olafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAAMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everette C. Mash, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?