Rivera v. Exeter Finance Corp.
Plaintiff: Edgar Rivera
Defendant: Exeter Finance Corp.
Case Number: 1:2015cv01057
Filed: May 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/19/2019, re: 209 plaintiff's Amended Motion for Reconsideration of the Denial of Plaintiff's Second Motion for Class Certification is DENIED. (sphil, )
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 40 Motion for Protective Order; Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2016. The defendant is to have a representative available with the proper security clearance to allow the plaintiff 3 hours to gather data. Regardless of what data is obtained by the plaintiff, the data is to be preserved until the Court can hold another hearing. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS denying 32 Motion to Stay by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/01/2016.(mdave, )
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/5/2015. (mdave, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Exeter Finance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Rivera
Represented By: David Neal McDevitt
Represented By: Russell S. Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exeter Finance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?