Wellons, Inc. v. Eagle Valley Clean Energy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wellons, Inc.
Defendant: Eagle Valley Clean Energy, LLC, Evergreen Clean Energy Corporation, Clearwater Ventures, LLC, United States of America Rural Utilities Service, Dean L. Rostrom, Kendric B. Wait, George Sorenson, Wilcox Revocable Trust and South Sea Enteprises, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv01252
Filed: June 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER granting 536 Motion to Set Aside ; denying 538 Motion for Sanctions; denying 552 Motion to Deposit Funds; denying as moot 553 Motion to Quash by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/18/19. (jdyne, )
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER denying 408 Motion for New Trial by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/29/17. (jdyne, )
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER denying 375 Motion Regarding Entry of Final Judgment by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/24/17. (jdyne, )
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 246 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 256 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 286 Motion for Leave; denying 290 Motion in Limine; denying 292 Motion in Limine by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/22/17. (jdyne, )
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 216 Wellons, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Consent and Agreement by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/7/17. (jdyne, )
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for an eight day Jury Trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on January 23, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for December 20, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. Please see the order for details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/11/15. (rbjsec. )
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Motion to Dismiss; denying 22 Motion to Dismiss; denying 26 Motion to Dismiss. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/24/2015.(mlace, )
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. Please see the order for additional details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/15/2015. (rbjsec. )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wellons, Inc. v. Eagle Valley Clean Energy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wellons, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Represented By: Stephen Garrett Leatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Valley Clean Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Clean Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearwater Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Rural Utilities Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean L. Rostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendric B. Wait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilcox Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Sea Enteprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?