Beliz v. Loan Simple, Inc
Plaintiff: Wanda Beliz
Defendant: Loan Simple, Inc, Castle Law Group, LLC, The, CitiMortgage, Inc, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Thomas S. Mowle, Thomas (I) S. Mowle, Malcolm & Cisneros, Ronald W. Servis and Patricia D. Sachez
Case Number: 1:2015cv01284
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff re: 84 Order on Report and Recommendations by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/3/2016. (vbarn)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER stating that this motion is self-executing upon filing 35 Motion to Dismiss Party ; and DENYING as moot 28 Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/07/15.(nmarb, )
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 15 July 9, 2015 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge: Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction (Doc. # 5 ) is hereby DENIED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/28/2015. (athom, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beliz v. Loan Simple, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Beliz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loan Simple, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castle Law Group, LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc
Represented By: Zhonette M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas S. Mowle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas (I) S. Mowle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm & Cisneros
Represented By: Nathan Frederick Jones Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald W. Servis
Represented By: Nathan Frederick Jones Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia D. Sachez
Represented By: Nathan Frederick Jones Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?