Synergy Resources Corporation v. Briller, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Synergy Resources Corporation
Defendant: Briller, Inc., R.W.L. Enterprises and Robert W. Loveless
Counter_claimant: Briller, Inc., Robert W. Loveless and R.W.L. Enterprises
Counter_defendant: Synergy Resources Corporation, Edward Holloway and Craig D. Rasmuson
Case Number: 1:2015cv01337
Filed: June 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part 63 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/5/16.(jdyne, )
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 36 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; granting 47 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/10/16.(jdyne, )
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a ten day Jury Trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on October 17, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for September 23, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. Please see the order for additional details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/30/15. (rbjsec. )
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 9/17/2015 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/17/2015, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/29/15. (sgrim)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/17/2015, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/29/15. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synergy Resources Corporation v. Briller, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briller, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.W.L. Enterprises
Represented By: Scott M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Loveless
Represented By: Scott M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synergy Resources Corporation
Represented By: Randall J. Feuerstein
Represented By: Fritz William Ganz
Represented By: Ronald Walter Opsahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Briller, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Robert W. Loveless
Represented By: Scott M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: R.W.L. Enterprises
Represented By: Scott M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Synergy Resources Corporation
Represented By: Randall J. Feuerstein
Represented By: Fritz William Ganz
Represented By: Ronald Walter Opsahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Edward Holloway
Represented By: Randall J. Feuerstein
Represented By: Fritz William Ganz
Represented By: Ronald Walter Opsahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Craig D. Rasmuson
Represented By: Randall J. Feuerstein
Represented By: Fritz William Ganz
Represented By: Ronald Walter Opsahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?