Strepka v. Alba et al
Plaintiff: Mark Alan Strepka
Defendant: Francisco L. Alba, Francisco (I) L. Alba, Jaime S. Disbrow, Jaime (I) S. Disbrow, Christopher G. Penny and Christopher (I) G. Penny
Case Number: 1:2015cv01444
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER adopting 45 Report and Recommendations.; granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/17/17. (jdyne, )
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER; 31 Motion for Leave of Court to File an Amended Brief in Opposition to Defendant Albas Rule 12(b)(6) Motion (dkt. #21) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to accept Plaintiffs Response [#31-1, #31-2, #31-3, #31-4, #31-5] to Defendants Motion to Dismiss [#21] for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. Defendant may file a Reply on or before May 3, 2016, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/19/16.(morti, )
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/17/15. (dkals, )
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Request to Lift the Stay and to Re-Open Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/16/15.(dkals, )
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Stay the Complaint and Administratively Close the Action by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/13/15. (dkals, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strepka v. Alba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Alan Strepka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco L. Alba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco (I) L. Alba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime S. Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime (I) S. Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher G. Penny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher (I) G. Penny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?