Aguilar v. Colorado State Penententry, et al

Plaintiff: Lazaro Aguilar
Defendant: Colorado State Penententry, et al and Saint Thomas Moore Hospitial, et al
Case Number: 1:2015cv01481
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 54 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24, and 55 "Motion for Admission of (2) Further Issues Desire to Raise on Appeal," by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/22/16.(dkals, )
March 31, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/31/16. (dkals, )
February 18, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 39 Motion Petitioning Contempt Court by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/18/16.(dkals, )
December 21, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Motion for Admission of Documentary Evidence by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/21/15.(dkals, )
December 11, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/11/15.(dkals, )
October 5, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 16 "Motion of Amend" by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/5/15.(dkals, )
September 10, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to amend or respond by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/10/15. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar v. Colorado State Penententry, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazaro Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado State Penententry, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Thomas Moore Hospitial, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?