Gabriel v. El Paso County Criminal Justice Center et al
Plaintiff: |
Vincent Gabriel |
Defendant: |
El Paso County Criminal Justice Center, Theresa Pedley, Correct Care Solutions, Correctional Healthcare Companies and Bill Elder |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv01491 |
Filed: |
July 14, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
El Paso |
Presiding Judge: |
Kathleen M. Tafoya |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
137
ORDER USCA re: 128 USCA Letter with Writ of Mandamus filed with Court of Appeals. Petition for Write of Mandamus is Denied on 3/22/2016. (cmira)
|
November 17, 2015 |
Filing
95
ORDER denying 92 Certification for Interlocutory Appeal of Order Re: Denial of Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment 47 Motion for Interlocutory. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/17/2015.(mlace, )
|
November 13, 2015 |
Filing
91
ORDER denying 89 Second Amended Motion To Reconsider 84 Order Granting Defendant Cooper's Motion for Extension To File Out of Time. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/13/2015.(mlace, )
|
November 12, 2015 |
Filing
90
ORDER denying 88 Amended Motion To Reconsider 84 Order Granting Defendant Cooper's Motion for Extension To File Out of Time. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/12/2015.(mlace, )
|
November 9, 2015 |
Filing
84
ORDER that Plaintiffs Objection to Magistrate Judges Ruling 63 , filed October 22, 2015, is overruled. (evana, )
|
November 2, 2015 |
Filing
78
COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Status Conference held on 11/2/2015. Granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Seek Leave of Court to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff's First A mended Civil Rights Compliant [sic] with Request for Jury Trial 31 is accepted for filing as of 11/2/2015 and is the operative pleading. Attachments from 28 are accepted as attachments to the First Amended Civil Rights Complaint. Granting 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Request Class 1 Restriction for All Sensitive Documents Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2. Denying as moot 9 Defendant El Paso County Justice Center's Motion to Dismiss Plai ntiff's Complaint (Doc. 2) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Denying as moot 10 Defendants Correct Care Solutions and Correctional Care Solutions and Correctional Healthcare Companies Motion to Dismiss. Denying as moot 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Seek Leave of Court to Amend Complaint. Denying as moot 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Seek Leave of Court to Amend Complaint. Denying 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay All Proceedings and Liti gation with Defendant Pedley-Cooper until after the District Judge Reviews and Rules on Plaintiff's Objections to the Magistrate Judges October 9, 2015 Minute Order Ruling. Discovery is STAYED until anticipated Motions to Dismiss as to the First Amended Complaint are decided. Court Reporter: FTR - E. E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A402. (emill)
|
October 26, 2015 |
Filing
66
ORDER re 55 Motion for Reconsideration. After a review of the motion and Plaintiff's related brief, the court finds no justification warranting reconsideration of its previous order. Therefore, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/26/2015. (cbslc2)
|
July 17, 2015 |
Filing
5
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/29/2015 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 9/22/2015, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/17/15. (sgrim)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?