Pinewood Townhome Association, Inc., The v. Auto Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pinewood Townhome Association, Inc., The
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv01604
Filed: July 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. # 51 ). This Court's previous Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. # 61 ) is VACATED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/13/2017. (athom, )
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. # 51 ). By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/13/2017. (athom, )
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/7/15. (bsimm, )
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/3/15. A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/4/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bsimm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinewood Townhome Association, Inc., The v. Auto Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinewood Townhome Association, Inc., The
Represented By: David Jeffrey Furtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: John David Mereness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?