Bar-ton v. Westminster Parole Board et al

Plaintiff: Andre Barton
Defendant: Westminster Parole Board and Fillmore Echert
Case Number: 1:2015cv01630
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 47 "Motion to Settlement" by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/22/16.(dkals, )
November 24, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying motion 22 by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/24/15.(dkals, )
November 5, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 18 Motion by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/5/15.(dkals, )
October 26, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying without prejudice leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/26/15. (dkals, )
July 31, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/31/2015. (agarc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bar-ton v. Westminster Parole Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westminster Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fillmore Echert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?