Estate of Jaime Ceballos et al v. Husk et al

Plaintiff: Estate of Jaime Ceballos, Quianna Vigil, Naveyah Ceballos and Jayden Ceballos
Defendant: William Husk, Dante Carbone, Randy Nelson and City of Thornton
Case Number: 1:2015cv01783
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc. 40 Defendants' motion for summary judgment is DENIED with respect to Plaintiffs' First, Third, and Fifth Claims for Relief; the motion for summary judgment is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs' Fourth Claim for Relief, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/1/17. (ktera)
January 13, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/13/16. (ktera)
January 4, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Pursuant to Procedural Order Number One 18 , a scheduling conference will be held on January 25, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Str eet, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on January 15, 2016. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/4/16. (ktera)
October 27, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26(f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A) shall be made within 14 days after that conference. Counsel for the plaintiffs will telephone chambers within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/27/15. (ktera)
October 20, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Upon review of the Stipulation for Dismissal of Randy Nelson and Substitution of Party 15 , Randy Nelson is dismissed without prejudice and the City of Thornton is substituted with respect to Plaintiffs' Third Claim for Relief. Each party will pay their own fees and costs with respect to the referenced Stipulation, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/20/15. (ktera)
September 17, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Upon reassignment of this civil action and this Court's case management procedures, the October 20, 2015, scheduling/planning conference 4 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe is vacated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/17/15. (ktera)
August 18, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/18/15, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form. Consent Form due by 9/30/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (nmarb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Jaime Ceballos et al v. Husk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jaime Ceballos
Represented By: Erica Tick Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quianna Vigil
Represented By: Erica Tick Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naveyah Ceballos
Represented By: Erica Tick Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayden Ceballos
Represented By: Erica Tick Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Husk
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dante Carbone
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Nelson
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Thornton
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?