Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, Colorado, The v. United States Department of the Interior
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, Colorado, The
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 1:2015cv01784
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Garfield
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/10/2016 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/13/16. (sgrim)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER of Administrative Closure, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/2/15. (sgrim)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/16/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 11/9/2015, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/15. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, Colorado, The v. United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Garfield, Colorado, The
Represented By: Alyson Meyer Gould
Represented By: Kent H. Holsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Zeyen Julian Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?