O'Sullivan v. Geico Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Donald O'Sullivan
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv01838
Filed: August 25, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2018 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendant's Motion for Review of Clerk's Award of Costs (ECF No. 183 ) is DENIED. The Clerk's prior taxation of $6,255.92 against Defendant (ECF No. 182 ) is SUSTAINED, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/20/2018. (angar, )
April 10, 2017 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Pre-Trial Legal Issues, Including Those Raised in 142 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Geico Casualty & 150 Objections filed by Donald O'Sullivan by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/10/2017. (wjmlc2, )
March 24, 2017 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; and granting in part and denying in part 103 Defendant's Amended Motion in Limine, as set out on the various issues in written order. by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/24/2017. (wjmlc2, )
February 7, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Strike Report and Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert David Torres and granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Expert Witness Robert Baldwin. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 02/07/2017. (cthom, )
February 2, 2017 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment (Public Entry for 60 Restricted Document). This case REMAINS SET for a Final Trial Preparation Conference on March 24, 2017, and a 5-day jury trial commencing April 10, 2017. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/02/2017. (cthom, )
January 25, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/25/2016. (slibi, )
August 27, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Counsel shall forthwith comply with the First and Final Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases (Docket No. 2) entered on August 25, 2015. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/27/2015. (emill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Sullivan v. Geico Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Gregory Keith Falls
Represented By: Meloney Cargil Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald O'Sullivan
Represented By: Chad Patrick Hemmat
Represented By: Ethan Andrew McQuinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?