NV5, Inc. v. KL&A, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
NV5, Inc. |
Defendant: |
KL&A, Inc. and Ware Malcomb |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv01898 |
Filed: |
September 1, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard P. Matsch |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 18, 2016 |
Filing
34
ORDER Approving Joint Agreement for Limited Discovery 33 , filed pursuant to this Court's order at the March 11, 2016, conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/18/16. (ktera)
|
February 18, 2016 |
Filing
31
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Pursuant to Procedural Order Number One 16 , a scheduling conference will be held on March 11, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Stre et, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 1, 2016. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/18/16. (ktera)
|
December 29, 2015 |
Filing
29
MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing proceedings held before Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/29/2015. Granting 25 Motion to Stay through mediation, not arbitration. FTR: K. Terasaki. (babia)
|
September 14, 2015 |
Filing
16
PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26(f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A) shall be made withi n 14 days after that conference. The proposed discovery plan will be in the form of the Scheduling Order which will be submitted to chambers in paper form 10 days before the date of the Scheduling Conference. Counsel for the plaintiff will telephone chambers within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/14/15. (ktera)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?