Wilk v. St. Vrain Valley School District et al.

Plaintiff: Erik Wilk, Derek Wilk and Jami Wilk
Defendant: St. Vrain Valley School District, Town of Erie Police Department, John Creighton, Joie Siegrist, Bob Smith, Debbie Lammers, John Ahrens, Paula Peairs, Mike Schiers, Don Haddad, Greg Winger, Matthew Buchler, Marc Vasquez, Dan Niemoth and Aaron Haddox
Case Number: 1:2015cv01925
Filed: September 4, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Pursuant to agreement of the parties, Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants John Creighton, Joie Siegrist, Bob Smith, Debbie Lammers, John Ahrens, Paula Peairs, and Mike Schiers, in their individual and o fficial capacities, and against Don Haddad in his official capacity, are hereby dismissed with prejudice; the motion for summary judgment filed by the school defendants Doc. 65 is GRANTED, and judgment shall enter dismissing Plaintiffs' cla ims against St. Vrain Valley School District, Don Haddad, Greg Winger, and Matthew Buchler; and the Erie Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Doc. 55 is GRANTED and judgment shall enter dismissing Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Dan Niemoth, Aaron Haddox, and Marc Vasquez, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/27/17. (ktera)
December 7, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pursuant to Procedural Order Number 34 , a scheduling conference will be held on January 8, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The pro posed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on December 29, 2015. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/7/15. (ktera)
November 18, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by each party, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/18/15. (ktera)
October 23, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ORDER Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26(f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a) (1)(A) shall be made wi thin 14 days after that conference. The proposed discovery plan will be in the form of the Scheduling Order which will be submitted to chambers in paper form 10 days before the date of the Scheduling Conference. Counsel for the plaintiffs will te lephone chambers within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/23/15. (ktera)
September 23, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/23/15 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form. Consent Form due by 10/27/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilk v. St. Vrain Valley School District et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Wilk
Represented By: Joel Walter Cantrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Wilk
Represented By: Joel Walter Cantrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami Wilk
Represented By: Joel Walter Cantrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Vrain Valley School District
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Erie Police Department
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Creighton
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joie Siegrist
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Smith
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Lammers
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ahrens
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Peairs
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Schiers
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Haddad
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Winger
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Buchler
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Vasquez
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Niemoth
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Haddox
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: J. Andrew Nathan
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?