Mueller v. Swift et al

Plaintiff: David Mueller
Defendant: Scott Borchetta, Taylor Swift, Frank Bell, Andrea Swift and Scott Swift
Case Number: 1:2015cv01974
Filed: September 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Granting in Part 135 Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Report, Opinions, and Testimony of Jeffrey B. Opp. Plaintiff's counsel is DIRECTED toinform Mr. Opp of the rulings set out in this Order, and Mr. Opp's anticipated testimony at trial will be limited accordingly. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/25/2017. (angar, )
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting 136 Motion to Exclude. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/21/2017. (angar, )
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Granting in Part Defendants' 154 MOTION in Limine. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/20/2017. (angar, )
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER on Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. Defendants' Motion for Sanctions for Plaintiff's Spoliation of Evidence (ECF No. 139 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/19/2017. (angar, )
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion for Summary Judgment (Public entry for 108 Restricted Document. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/31/2017. (angar, )
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/14/16. (lgale, )
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER; 68 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerkof Court shall accept Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint [68-1] for filing as of the date of this Minute Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/25/16.(morti, )
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE: PROTECTION AND INADVERTENT PRODUCTION OF PRIVILEGED MATERIALS by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/21/16. (lgale, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mueller v. Swift et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mueller
Represented By: M. Gabriel McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Borchetta
Represented By: Jenna Lyn Harris
Represented By: John R. Jacobson
Represented By: Cara F. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Swift
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Represented By: Courtney Ann Sullivan
Represented By: Katherine Marie Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Bell
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Represented By: Courtney Ann Sullivan
Represented By: Katherine Marie Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Swift
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Represented By: Courtney Ann Sullivan
Represented By: Katherine Marie Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Swift
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Represented By: Courtney Ann Sullivan
Represented By: Katherine Marie Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?