Fischer et al v. Klescewski et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Fischer, Jessica Fischer, M. F. and T. F.
Defendant: Drew Klescewski, Nichole Backus, H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP, Josh Vaughn, Michael Deedon, Jeremy Ehrlich and Heidi Walts
Case Number: 1:2015cv01995
Filed: September 13, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 80 Motion for Summary Judgment: Defendants Josh Vaughn, Michael Deedon, Jeremy Ehrlich, and Heidi Walts are entitled to judgment in their favor on all claims asserted against them, and such judgment will enter at the close of this c ase; and, 81 H&M Defendants' 81 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED with respect to the Fischers' claim of intentional infliction of emotional distress, and otherwise DENIED. This case REMAINS SET for a Final Trial Preparation Conference on May 5, 2017, at 11:00 a.m., and a 5-day Jury Trial beginning on May 22, 2017, at 8:30 a.m., both in Courtroom A801. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 03/22/2017. (cthom, )
April 14, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/14/16. (bsimm, )
October 8, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/08/15 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer et al v. Klescewski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Fischer
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Fischer
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. F.
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. F.
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Klescewski
Represented By: Andrew Puschel Reitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Backus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP
Represented By: Andrew Puschel Reitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Deedon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Walts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?