O'Connor v. Bassoff et al.

Plaintiff: Andrew J. O'Connor
Defendant: Tobey Bassoff, Jolene Radostis, Robbyn Fernandez, Bruce Messinger, Ryan Elementary School, Boulder Valley School District No. RE2 and Rick Kellogg
Case Number: 1:2015cv02121
Filed: September 25, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 106 Amended Motion to Compel Production of Documents and for Costs Incurred, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/20/2016.(slibi, )
February 2, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 61 Motion to Recuse Magistrate Judge Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/02/2016.(slibi, )
December 17, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER Denying 37 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b) (1)(A). Denying 36 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Order to Dismiss in Part. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/17/2015. (emill)
December 3, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM. On or before 1/26/2016 parties shall complete and file the Consent / Non-Consent Form 32 . Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/3/2015. (emill)
November 16, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DENYING TRO MOTION. The Second Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(A) (ECF No. 27 ) is DENIED, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/16/2015.(agarc, )
November 3, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Second Amended Emergency Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief Or, In the Alternative, Request for Emergency Hearing by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/3/15.(dkals, )
October 20, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/20/15. (dkals, )
October 19, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Amended Emergency Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/19/15.(dkals, )
October 8, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES AND ORDER DENYING 7 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/8/15.(dkals, )
September 28, 2015 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/28/15. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor v. Bassoff et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobey Bassoff
Represented By: Randolph Christian Griffin
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolene Radostis
Represented By: Randolph Christian Griffin
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbyn Fernandez
Represented By: Randolph Christian Griffin
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Messinger
Represented By: Randolph Christian Griffin
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Elementary School
Represented By: Randolph Christian Griffin
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Valley School District No. RE2
Represented By: Randolph Christian Griffin
Represented By: Michael W. Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?