Trans-West, Inc. v. Southwest Luxury Coach Sales, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Trans-West, Inc.
Defendant: Southwest Luxury Coach Sales, LLC and Scott Buchannan
Case Number: 1:2015cv02233
Filed: October 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Subpoenas; granting 55 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Subpoena; granting 64 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Supplements to Discovery Motions, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/28/2016.(slibi, )
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Stay; granting 50 Report and Recommendations. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 03/25/2016.(cthom, )
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 33 Motion to Stay or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/19/2016.(slibi, )
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/30/2015.(slibi, )
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/21/2015. (emill)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 28 Defendants' Motion to Stay or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss, as set forth in the order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/18/2015.(emill)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 18 Stipulated Possession Order. Show Cause Hearing 12/9/2015 1:30 PM is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/8/2015.(emill)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEMPORARY ORDER to Trans-West, Inc. to Preserve Property, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/01/2015. (slibi, )
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/09/2015. Pilot Program Consent Form due on or before 12/3/2015. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 12/17/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (slibi, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trans-West, Inc. v. Southwest Luxury Coach Sales, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trans-West, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Cage
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Luxury Coach Sales, LLC
Represented By: Neal J.G. McConomy
Represented By: Scott C. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Buchannan
Represented By: Neal J.G. McConomy
Represented By: Scott C. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?