Miller v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: George Miller
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv02268
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER On Motions In Limine, granting in part and denying in part 79 and 81 . ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/11/2017. (angar, )
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/09/2017. (angar, )
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/16/15 Setting Scheduling/Planning Confernece and Setting Deadline for Filing of Pilot Program Consent Form. Consent Form due by 11/26/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Miller
Represented By: Jeffrey Ragan Seely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?